AGE CONCERN VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION FOR THE ELDERLY MERSTHAM, REDHILL AND REIGATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a range of services for older people, including a day centre 4 x weekly, men's shed, befriending service, shopping trips, social outings, alliance with Citizens Advice Service, access to legal advice, chiropody and hair and beauty treatments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,125 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
29 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 03 July 2017: CIO registration
- 16 September 2020: Funds received from 247634 VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION FOR THE ELDERLY - MERSTHAM, ...
- AGECONCERN VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION FOR THE ELDERLY MERSTHAM REDHILL AND REIGATE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Louise Dadswell | Chair | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brett Loft | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
martin gillard | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Dunn | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Pidgeon | Trustee | 12 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA FRASER DL | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANAND GULATI LLB | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.00k | £86.45k | £133.03k | £106.35k | £131.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.17k | £79.86k | £131.01k | £156.60k | £157.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | £40.49k | £22.50k | £15.00k | £10.13k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AND AROUND MERSTHAM,REDHILL AND REIGATE WITHIN THE COUNTY OF SURREY ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT")
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MERSTHAM CENTRE
WELDON WAY
MERSTHAM
REDHILL
RH1 3QB
- Phone:
- 01737645636
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window