BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE OPEN UNIVERSITY OF ISRAEL (BFOUI)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting, advancing and assisting in the advancement of enducation in general and the educational aims, objects and activities of the Open University of Israel .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Israel
Governance
- 24 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Trager- Lewis | Trustee | 08 February 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Professor Malka Ajzenstadt | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
GORDON HAUSMANN | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.98k | £196.38k | £145.19k | £255.92k | £50 | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.26k | £196.35k | £146.34k | £258.04k | £833 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROMOTE, ADVANCE OR ASSIST IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN GENERAL AND THE EDUCATIONAL AIMS, OBJECTS AND ACTIVITIES OF THE OPEN UNIVERSITY OF ISRAEL ("OUI") IN PARTICULAR, AND THROUGH OR IN ASSOCIATION WITH THE OUI, TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN PROMOTING SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, THE STATE OF ISRAEL, OR ELSEWHERE AND IN SUCH PROPORTION AND MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C H Hausmann & Co
5 De Walden Court
85 New Cavendish Street
London
W1W 6XD
- Phone:
- 02074366333
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window