LIONS CLUB OF FLEET (CIO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate within our local community and undertake fundraising events in order that we may financially assist local charities and good causes. Some of our larger events include "Beerfest" in August, Town Firework Display in November and a touring Santa Sleigh in December.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £5,675 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 February 2018: CIO registration
- 15 November 2018: Funds received from 279279 LIONS CLUB OF FLEET CHARITY TRUST FUND
- FLEET LIONS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Edwin Pitkin | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Munday | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian William Proctor | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Storey | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Grahame John Pullen | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Dawn Roberts | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
LISA JANE RUST | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bernard Collen | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK LYNTON COOPER | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.48k | £44.91k | £113.98k | £131.02k | £144.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.53k | £46.66k | £98.90k | £115.44k | £145.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.38k | £6.15k | £15.87k | £2.90k | £5.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 15 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN THE TERRITORIAL AREA OF THE CLUB AND ELSEWHERE FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHARITABLE BODIES, TRUSTS, ASSOCIATIONS, INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED OR ABOUT TO BE ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS AFORESAID.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Westover Road
FLEET
Hampshire
GU51 3DB
- Phone:
- 01252624770
- Email:
- secretary@fleetlions.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window