KITE NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth-led organisation, dedicated to the advancement of global citizenship by helping university students create meaningful initiatives for the development of disadvantaged communities around the world
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Canada
- Kenya
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- KITE INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING AMONGST A GLOBAL COMMUNITY OF UNIVERSITY STUDENTS WITH THE AIMS OF CREATING MEANINGFUL INITIATIVES BENEFITING DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES ACROSS THE WORLD AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF SKILLS, CAPABILITIES AND CAPACITIES OF VOLUNTEERS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window