GREEK ORTHODOX CHURCH OF ST BASIL & ST PAISIOS IN LINCOLN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(i) Worship according to the Greek Orthodox tradition. Congregation currently includes Greeks, Cypriots, English, Bulgarians, Romanias, Russian, Latvians, Albanians & Germans. (ii) Church open for spiritual advice four days a week. (iii) Greek School every Saturday . (iv) Annual festival held on July 15
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 18 September 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Evdokios Ioannou | Chair | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christos Lois | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Panagiotis Sakellariou Fr | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
HAMBIS MAVROMATIS | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.79k | £31.86k | £70.96k | £61.96k | £47.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.58k | £10.45k | £20.53k | £15.51k | £27.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 OCT 1964 AS AMENDED ON 02 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
(I) TO PRESERVE AND PROPAGATE THE CHRISTIAN ORTHODOX FAITH AND TRADITIONS AS CONTAIN IN HOLY SCRIPTURE AS PRACTICED IN THE LIFE OF THE CHURCH, AS CONFIRMED BY THE ECUMENICAL AND LOCAL COUNCILS AND AS INTERPRETED, PRESERVED AND TAUGHT BY THE GREAT CHURCH OF CHRIST, THE ECUMENICAL PATRIARCHATE OF CONSTANTINOPLE. (II) TO PRESERVE THE ORIGINAL LANGUAGE OF THE NEW TESTAMENT IN DIVINE WORSHIP AND IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL LIFE OF THE FAITHFUL AND TO MINSTER TO THE PEOPLE THROUGH CANONICAL SERVICES CONDUCTED ACCORDING TO THE ORDER OF THE GREAT CHURCH OF CONSTANTINOPLE BY CANONICAL PRIESTS, AND THROUGH SERMONS AND THROUGH CATECHISM AND GREEK LANGUAGE SCHOOLS. (III) TO ESTABLISH A CHURCH FOR THE WORSHIP OF THE TRIUNE GOD AND A SCHOOL FOR THE PURPOSE OF TEACHING THE GREEK LANGUAGE TO CHILDREN AND ADULTS. (IV) TO RECEIVE INTO THE ORTHODOX FAITH, BY BAPTISM OR CHRISMATION, ALL THOSE WHO FREELY DECIDE AND SINCERELY DESIRE TO ADOPT THE ORTHODOX FAITH, AND TO LIVE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ITS SPIRITUAL AND MORAL TEACHING. (V) TO UNDERTAKE PHILANTHROPIC WORK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE WHO NEED PROTECTION, ASSISTANCE AND MEDICAL CARE, TO PROVIDE FOR THE WELFARE OF THE POOR AND FOR THE BURIAL OF THOSE GREEKS WHO PASS AWAY WITHOUT FINANCIAL MEANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREEK ORTHODOX CHURCH OF ST BASIL
HIGH STREET
LINCOLN
LN5 8JB
- Phone:
- 07824456805
- Website:
-
ORTHODOXLINCOLN.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window