BAGBY AND BALK VILLAGE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bagby and Balk Village society is a charity set up to support the community. We insure and maintain a playpark which is a hub for children / parents and grandparents. We host community events and social activities. We support the local football team and insure the sports field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 July 2023
Total income includes £1,241 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Mierzwinski | Chair | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Anne Gormley | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAWN DUNCALF | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM DUNCALF | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
AMY SHEPHERD | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA CARNEY | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CULMER | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES SHEPHERD | Trustee | 30 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/07/2019 | 25/07/2020 | 25/07/2021 | 25/07/2022 | 25/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.75k | £6.75k | £14.07k | £7.86k | £6.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.09k | £5.09k | £3.34k | £12.93k | £12.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.97k | N/A | £2.64k | N/A | £1.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 July 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 July 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 July 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 July 2020 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2020 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 July 2019 | 03 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2019 | 30 August 2020 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF BAGBY, BALK AND SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPTIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY HALL AND TO MAINTAIN, MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A FACILITY FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Hawthorne Terrace
Bagby
THIRSK
North Yorkshire
YO7 2PQ
- Phone:
- 07850816440
- Email:
- lucymierzwinski@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window