Financial history AFROCATS

Charity number: 1173334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/06/2020 05/06/2021 05/06/2022 05/06/2023 05/06/2024
Total gross income £24.49k £52.30k £52.52k £88.48k £223.86k
Total expenditure £7.00k £32.48k £63.37k £98.96k £165.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.00k