FAMILY CONNECTION ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FCA empowers parents through educational activities, promoting child development through play. We support families with food banks, energy-saving tips, and nutrition education. Our workshops engage youth in debates and STEM projects, fostering innovation and future aspirations in science and technology, aiming to alleviate living costs and enhance community well-being. Place:60 Beeton Road B18 4QD
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 February 2024
Total income includes £21,564 from 21564 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 June 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSE Kalunga-Nyota | Chair | 15 February 2013 |
|
|||||
Gea Bondo Makunga | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emerga Nature Mombo | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel lemvoka | Trustee | 13 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/02/2020 | 15/02/2021 | 15/02/2022 | 15/02/2023 | 15/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.25k | £15.34k | £15.83k | £16.84k | £22.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.43k | £13.98k | £8.96k | £14.72k | £15.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £21.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 February 2024 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 February 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 February 2022 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 February 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 February 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 FEB 2013 AS AMENDED ON 12 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG MIGRANTS, INCLUDING REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS, WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION (“THE BENEFICIARIES”) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) IDENTIFYING NEEDS AND WHERE NECESSARY PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR BENEFICIARIES TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTE THEIR HEALTH AND WELL-BEING; B) PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP OFFERING SUPPORT, SERVICES AND ASSISTANCE TO BENEFICIARIES TO ENCOURAGE AND ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITHIN THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 CHURCH GREEN
BIRMINGHAM
B20 2HP
- Phone:
- 07492711447
- Email:
- rosenyota@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window