Accounts and annual returns ORGANISATION DESIGN INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1174009
Charity reporting is up to date (132 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 March 2025 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 March 2025 132 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 March 2025 494 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 March 2025 498 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 February 2020 On Time Download Open in new window