Accounts and annual returns ARBOURTHORNE AND DISTRICT RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 509735
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 March 2025 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2025 358 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 November 2022 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 July 2022 532 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required