Financial history ARBOURTHORNE AND DISTRICT RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 509735
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.23k £10.39k £9.68k £19.19k £18.02k
Total expenditure £13.32k £3.03k £5.43k £23.17k £28.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.02k £5.60k