YORKSHIRE BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
YBKA promotes beekeeping throughout Yorkshire, providing education, training and support for our members and informing the public at large, particularly children, about the important role that the honeybee plays in the natural ecology.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- Bradford City
- City Of York
- Darlington
- Doncaster
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 05 March 1988: Standard registration
- Y B K A (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare McGettigan | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|||||
LINDA SCHOFIELD | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK MILLARD | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
NORBERT ERICH WILLI COOPER | Trustee | 28 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.79k | £55.69k | £61.94k | £63.63k | £70.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.87k | £52.09k | £58.42k | £64.76k | £67.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 02 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 1945 AS AMENDED ON 03 DEC 1949 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAR 1983 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAR 1990 AS AMENDED ON 07 DEC 2013 AS AMENDED ON 25 NOV 2017 AS AMENDED ON 24 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED ON 30 NOV 2019 AS AMENDED ON 27 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CRAFT OF BEEKEEPING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wharfe Bank House
Ings Road
Ulleskelf
TADCASTER
LS24 9SS
- Phone:
- 01937834809
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window