Governing document YORKSHIRE BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 509743

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 1945 AS AMENDED ON 03 DEC 1949 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAR 1983 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAR 1990 AS AMENDED ON 07 DEC 2013 AS AMENDED ON 25 NOV 2017 AS AMENDED ON 24 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED ON 30 NOV 2019 AS AMENDED ON 27 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CRAFT OF BEEKEEPING.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.