Financial history COMMUNITY KEEPERS UK

Charity number: 1173232
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £325 £0 £0
Total expenditure £482 £661 £0 £334 £315
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A