LEGACY SPORTS AND EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation provides facilities, coaching and outreach programmes to encourage local community involvement in amateur sport. The Foundation will establish and run local community centres to provide activities focusing on education, recreation and sport and providing health and activity-related outreach to local communities. It also partners with already operational local sports charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 November 2017: Standard registration
- LEGACY COMMUNITY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT LESTER ZAMORA | Chair | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Maria Kell | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Savannah de Savary | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angela Denise Croucher | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Foreman Dwyer | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARK JAMES NOBLE | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
RIO GAVIN FERDINAND | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.08k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.39k | £16.28k | £1.00k | £1.48k | £33.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 February 2025 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2025 | 362 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 OCT 2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE ALL PURPOSES RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR: 1.1. THROUGH AN ASSOCIATION WITH SPORT TRAINING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING): (A) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION; AND (B) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND 1.2 TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES (AS IDENTIFIED FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE TRUSTEES) IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE TO A GREATER DEGREE IN SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cox, Costello & Horne
14-15 Lower Grosvenor Place
LONDON
SW1W 0EX
- Phone:
- 02072478334
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window