AJVIR SINGH SANDHU LEADERSHIP FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ajvir Singh Sandhu Leadership Foundation aims to develop talented individuals aged 11-25, by identifying the strengths within them to help them succeed to their full potential and follow their dreams. We provide a network and mentoring scheme with passionate individuals across a range of fields to connect with young people, and support them in overcoming any obstacles to achieve their goals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 21 July 2017: Standard registration
- AMRIK SINGH SANDHU LEADERSHIP FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMRIK SINGH SANDHU | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kalvir Kaur Cheema | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SABINDER ROBINSON-SANDHU | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
NARINDERJIT SANDHU | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.49k | £26.44k | £26.92k | £23.26k | £28.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.53k | £22.45k | £5.09k | £20.54k | £60.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 11 TO 25 BY A CREATING AND AWARDING TO YOUNG PEOPLE SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; B THE CREATION OF PRIZES TO BE AWARDED TO YOUNG PEOPLE C PROVIDING YOUNG PEOPLE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT D PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO YOUNG PEOPLE (EITHER THROUGH GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS AND CHARITIES WHO SUPPORT SUCH PERSONS) E PROVIDING YOUNG PEOPLE WITHIN THE ARMED FORCES WITH OPPORTUNITIES TO GAIN ADDITIONAL EXPERIENCE RELEVANT TO THEIR JOBS AND SUPPORTING SUCH PERSONS IN INCREASING THEIR TECHNICAL KNOWLEDGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES, COMPETITIONS AND PRIZES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RIVJA
MOTT STREET
LOUGHTON
IG10 4AP
- Phone:
- 07775740903
- Email:
- contact@ajvirlf.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window