THE HARRY WILSON KEYS MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Acts as an umbrella or resource body
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 13 March 1980: Standard registration
- THE "HARRY WILSON KEYS MEMORIAL FUND" (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW GIBBONS | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|||||
EDWARD ARNOLD FORD OSM | Trustee | 03 January 2018 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL RICHARD HEENAN | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|||||
KEVIN CHAWNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Peter Edward Minchin Parsons | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £799 | £915 | £1.51k | £482 | £933 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.45k | £1.10k | £1.10k | £232 | £354 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 DECEMBER 1979
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SHELTERED ACCOMMODATION FOR THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS FREEMASONS WHO PRIMARILY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) ARE OR AT ONE TIME HAVE BEEN MEMBERS OF A MOSONIC LODGE IN THE PROVINCE OF STAFFORDSHIRE AND THEIR NECESSITOUS DEPENDANTS.
Area of benefit
STAFFORDSHIRE AND NORTHERN COUNTY OF WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
PGL Staffs
5 SHAW PARK BUSINESS VILLAGE
SHAW ROAD
WOLVERHAMPTON
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV10 9LE
- Phone:
- 01902 745151
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window