MODERN MUSE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides an online platform which connects girls with female role models and companies to help them to make informed career and educational choices, particularly in the STEM sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 March 2017: CIO registration
- 25 July 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- 25 July 2023: Funds transferred to 1195284 TECH SHE CAN
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2018 | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £205.63k | £108.40k | £105.53k | £13.78k | £921 | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.98k | £82.98k | £93.03k | £36.02k | £7.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | £4.92k | £10.91k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PROMOTION OF GENDER EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AT ALL LEVELS AND ACROSS ALL SECTORS OF THE WORKFORCE, WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON THE INDUSTRY SECTORS WHERE WOMEN ARE UNDER-REPRESENTED, BY: 1 ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AMONGST YOUNG WOMEN AND GIRLS, IN PARTICULAR THOSE FROM LOWER SOCIOECONOMIC AND LESS PRIVILEGED BACKGROUNDS; AND 2 PROVIDING VIRTUAL MENTORING, CAREER ADVICE AND INSIGHT, DEVELOPMENT AND SUPPORT, INCLUDING: (A) PROVIDING ACCESS TO TRAINING WORKSHOPS AND PROGRAMS BY THIRD PARTY ENTITIES (WITH A FOCUS ON CHARITIES AND NON-PROFIT ORGANISATIONS) FOR SUCH PERSONS TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCES AND SKILLS IN STEM (SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING AND MATHEMATICS) FIELDS; AND (B) PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS TO GAIN ACCESS TO WORKPLACE ROLE MODELS, INSIGHT INTO THEIR EDUCATION AND CAREER JOURNEYS AND GUIDANCE ON HOW TO ACCESS THOSE EDUCATIONAL AND CAREER OPPORTUNITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window