Accounts and annual returns FOUNDATIONS 4 YOUNG PEOPLE
Charity number: 1171758

Charity reporting is overdue by 1554 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 459 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 459 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 824 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 824 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1189 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1554 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1554 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window