TORBAY LADIES LOUNGE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ladies Lounge is a "women's-only drop in" in the centre of Torquay set up to support the most vulnerable women in Torbay in need of emotional support, advice and information
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Torbay
Governance
- 23 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosalind Dianne Ede | Chair | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sylvie Hynes | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Bevis | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Wilkinson | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
IAN WILLIAM DEAKIN | Trustee | 23 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.60k | £15.79k | £51.64k | £11.33k | £16.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.50k | £13.31k | £19.85k | £34.94k | £44.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF WOMEN IN THE TORBAY AREA WHO ARE, MAY BECOME OR HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN SEX WORKING; STREET SLEEPING; DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; SUFFERING WITH MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS OR VICTIMS OF SUBSTANCE MISUSE ISSUES BY WORKING IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES TO PROVIDE SUPPORT, FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES AND SIGNPOSTING TO APPROPRIATE SERVICES TO ENABLE THEM TO BECOME AWARE OF ALTERNATIVE POSSIBILITIES FOR THEIR LIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Leys Road
TORQUAY
TQ2 6ED
- Phone:
- 07895155965
- Email:
- ladies.lounge58@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window