GOVERNMENT SECONDARY TECHNICAL SCHOOL EX-PUPILS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The association is formed to advance the education of children and improve the quality of education and provide scholarships for children in need at the school by providing educational resources at the Government Technical Secondary School in Freetown, Sierra Leone. This is done by hosting various fund-raising events and monthly subscribers by members. The Charity operates in the United Kingdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 18 April 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Princess Lilian Hanciles | Chair | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev LUCRESHIA LEIGH | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
GBASSAY HAWA TURAY | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JUSTUS FORTUNE | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.15k | £505 | £437 | £6.26k | £8.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.81k | £650 | £6.98k | £6.65k | £3.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 April 2022 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 April 2021 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 April 2022 | 435 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS AT GOVERNMENT SECONDARY TECHNICAL SCHOOL IN FREETOWN IN SIERRA LEONE (“THE SCHOOL”), BY: A) PROVIDING EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY, WITH MUTUAL RESPECT AND POSITIVE ENCOURAGEMENT, TO PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR POTENTIAL, CONTRIBUTE TO THEIR UPBRINGING AND DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES; B) IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING TEACHING AND LEARNING RESOURCES AND A SAFE TEACHING AND LEARNING ENVIRONMENT FOR ITS PUPILS; C) OTHERWISE SUPPORTING THE EDUCATIONAL WORK OF THE SCHOOL BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF BOYS AND GIRLS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT IN THE FORM OF SCHOLARSHIPS TO CHILDREN IN NEED AT THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Redwing Path
LONDON
Whinchat Road
SE28 0DL
- Phone:
- 07414851756
- Email:
- princesshanciles@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window