MANCHESTER ISLAMIC SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1173568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Manchester Islamic Society (MIS) is an Islamic organisation with a purpose to provide both Islamic and Arabic education to the general public. The organisation currently caters for the Islamic and arabic needs of children from the age of 4 at a temporary facility- Masjid Darul Hijra Aluha, Manchester. It is the long term objective of the organisation to secure a permanent place.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £17,763
Total expenditure: £8,759

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 June 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MIFTAU IDDRISU BSC.,PGD Chair 01 January 2015
None on record
Dr Muniratu Osmanu Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
IBRAHIM IDDRISSU BEng, PhD. Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.36k £13.90k £20.63k £16.16k £17.76k
Total expenditure £8.12k £9.93k £8.54k £10.62k £8.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 November 2023 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 05 November 2023 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 November 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 November 2021 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
323 NORTH ROAD
MANCHESTER
M11 4NY
Phone:
07999769617
Website:

No information available