BEDS PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting men and their families in Bedfordshire who have had prostate cancer (PCa), are undergoing treatment or who have been recently diagnosed and have to make a decision on which treatment to have. Also, creating awareness of PCa at exhibitions, fairs, well-being days and other events, undertaking free walk-in PSA testing days and helping to fund projects on PCa in local hospitals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bedford
Governance
- 28 July 2017: CIO registration
- BPCSG (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rodney Botteley | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEVE PEARCE | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JARVIS | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Dainton | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Dixon | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JIM FRANCIS | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.55k | £2.64k | £12.55k | £21.95k | £34.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.12k | £4.12k | £8.99k | £17.67k | £16.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 11 March 2025 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 April 2024
(These accounts |
11 March 2025 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 151 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE AFFECTED BY PROSTATE CANCER IN BEDFORDSHIRE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: • THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE AT ALL STAGES OF DIAGNOSES AND TREATMENT • THE PROVISION OF FUNDS TO SUPPORT NEW RESEARCH AND TREATMENT AT THE PROSTATE CANCER UNIT AT BEDFORD HOSPITAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Kimbolton Close
BEDFORD
MK41 8RP
- Phone:
- 01234960414
- Email:
- sw.pearce@sky.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window