FRIENDS OF FIENNES INSTITUTION

Charity number: 1172908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion and protection of health for the public benefit of the patients/residents of the Fiennes Institution on the island of Antigua in the twin island state of Antigua and Barbuda in the Caribbean through the provision of grants, items and services over and above those that the statutory authorities provide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024

Total income: £165
Total expenditure: £1,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Antigua And Barbuda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 May 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CLEVELAND WALKER Chair 01 January 2015
None on record
PASTOR CALLISTO Trustee 01 January 2016
NEW HOPE MINISTRIES UK
Received: On time
DR. SASTRY Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £1.10k £10.07k £215 £80 £165
Total expenditure £500 £7.96k £1.44k £736 £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 23 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2023 11 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2022 27 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 04 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 04 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 APPLE TREE CLOSE
YAXLEY
PETERBOROUGH
PE7 3JY
Phone:
07801790510
Website:

No information available