Torah Umesorah UK Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As written in the charity objects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 June 2017: Standard registration
- Torah Umesorah UK (Working name)
- THE MANCHESTER TORAH UMESORAH TEACHERS CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MORDECAI HALPERN | Chair | 11 January 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
DAVID GREENBLATT | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
PHILIP CORN | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.62k | £96.15k | £127.98k | £131.73k | £495.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.15k | £114.63k | £157.00k | £198.55k | £225.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 JAN 2017 as amended on 25 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AROUND THE WORLD IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND LECTURES FOR TEACHERS; THE PROVISION OF A CURRICULUM RESOURCES LIBRARY AND AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS; OR BY GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANIZATIONS WORLDWIDE THAT PROVIDE EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Torah Umesorah Teachers Centre
Park Gates
Bury New Road
Prestwich
MANCHESTER
M25 0JW
- Phone:
- 03336136136
- Email:
- uk@torah-umesorah.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window