Financial history THE FOUNDATION FOR PALLIATIVE CARE EDUCATION

Charity number: 1174758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £77.77k £68.99k £48.91k £6.08k £26.10k
Total expenditure £70.35k £38.08k £76.77k £35.38k £22.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A