Accounts and annual returns UBUNTU UGANDA

Charity number: 1172944
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 March 2024 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 September 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 October 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time