Trustees APPLEY BRIDGE WOMENS' INSTITUTE
Charity number: 509769

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Gibson | Chair | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bernie McGuirk | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Small | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robina Critchley | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
JEAN LOOKER | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANETTE ELLIS | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Gill | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joan Wadcock | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
janet mary trill | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.