Financial history PARALLEL HISTORIES

Charity number: 1174481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £55.45k £70.15k £131.80k £120.16k £107.80k
Total expenditure £29.57k £52.21k £93.59k £131.26k £119.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A