PARALLEL HISTORIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parallel Histories is a UK educational charity, founded in 2017, to improve the life chances of disadvantaged young people and promote social cohesion through innovation in humanities teaching. We empower teachers to teach controversial history by providing training, educational resources, and debating for young people. Through these three main activities, we work with over 1110 secondary schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Ramsey | Chair | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Albion | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sana Tariq | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harry Edmondson | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Franek | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare O'Sullivan | Trustee | 17 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.45k | £70.15k | £131.80k | £120.16k | £107.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.57k | £52.21k | £93.59k | £131.26k | £119.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN CONTROVERSIAL HISTORY TOPICS* BY RESEARCHING AND CREATING FREE EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS, INCLUDING INTERACTIVE VIDEOS AND DISTRIBUTING TO TEACHERS. * FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE CONTROVERSIAL HISTORY TOPICS ARE TOPICS WHICH ARE DISPUTED BY HISTORIANS, HAVE PARTISAN INTERPRETATIONS AND MAY CAUSE AN EMOTIONAL RESPONSE FROM LEARNERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 The Brickett
Sheering Road
Hatfield Heath
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
Hertfordshire
CM22 7LJ
- Phone:
- 07718101000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window