CHRIST CHURCH ENDCLIFFE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The focus of church activity remains the sharing of the Christian Gospel message to those who haven't heard it and the growing to maturity in faith of existing believers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
116 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 27 June 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV EDWARD FRANCIS QUENTIN PENNINGTON | Chair | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Benn | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
NATHAN ROSS FAIRHEAD | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mary de Jong | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruby Robinson | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Smith | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Walsh | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Michelle Ogborne | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Goepel | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosanne Elizabeth Arnhilda Gregg | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Amey | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Patricia Daniell | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Yianni | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Fischel Salter | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
REV ROB BRIDGEWATER | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ROY TURNER | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £261.43k | £253.74k | £235.80k | £320.53k | £265.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £218.55k | £214.55k | £221.76k | £260.63k | £252.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ESPECIALLY WITHIN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM, OR THE WORLD, AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Westbrook Court
Sharrow Vale Road
SHEFFIELD
S11 8YZ
- Phone:
- 07743942931
- Email:
- info@endcliffechurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window