Trustees CHRIST CHURCH ENDCLIFFE CIO
Charity number: 1173584

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV EDWARD FRANCIS QUENTIN PENNINGTON | Chair | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Benn | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
NATHAN ROSS FAIRHEAD | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mary de Jong | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruby Robinson | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Smith | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Walsh | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Michelle Ogborne | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Goepel | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosanne Elizabeth Arnhilda Gregg | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Amey | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Patricia Daniell | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Yianni | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Fischel Salter | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
REV ROB BRIDGEWATER | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ROY TURNER | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.