LIBERTY CHURCH SWANSEA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Liberty Church begins on Sunday and continues all week with ministries for children, toddlers, youth, men, women and the elderly. Operating out of Siloh Chapel in Landore, Swansea, Liberty Church provides opportunities for people to make new friends, grow in faith and serve. We love meeting the needs of our local community in practical ways.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maricel Lucero Paras | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Jenkins | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth James Ross | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Gillott | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ritchie | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.30k | £90.32k | £122.60k | £119.43k | £84.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.69k | £94.93k | £129.31k | £120.04k | £83.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 January 2023 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
06 January 2023 | 67 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jan 2018 as amended on 06 Dec 2023 as amended on 20 May 2024
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINE SET OUT IN THE UNDERWRITTEN FOURTH SCHEDULE AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN THE COUNTY OF SWANSEA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AND ELSEWHERE BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL, THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES, THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE INCLUDING VIDEO, AND AUDIO RECORDINGS AND BY ANY OTHER MEDIA WHICH IS, OR MAY BECOME, AVAILABLE; (B) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN THE COUNTY OF SWANSEA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT ;
Contact information
- Address:
-
Liberty Church Offices
Siloh Chapel
Pentre Treharne Road
Landore
SWANSEA
SA1 2PN
- Phone:
- 07547975479
- Email:
- info@libertych.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window