Financial history HERE FOR CATS

Charity number: 1172317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £81.42k £294.50k £122.10k £66.57k £108.16k
Total expenditure £65.75k £80.66k £72.83k £79.12k £113.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A