DAVID GEST FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
help children and young people through music
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- United States
Governance
- 24 April 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASIF RAHMAN | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JONES | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD MICHAEL BEARMAN | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ANTHONY WILLIAM GRIFFTHS | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
GARY VEAZEY | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 February 2025 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 March 2024 | 406 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17 APR 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY AWARDING GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS THAT PROVIDE SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THE YOUNG PERSONS’ SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O MSE BUSINESS MANAGEMENT LLP
4TH FLOOR 205 WARDOUR STREET
LONDON
W1F 8ZJ
- Phone:
- 07515660291
- Email:
- info@davidgestfoundation.org
- Website:
-
davidgestfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window