LEICESTER ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity number: 509784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Care and protection of stray and unwanted animals. The relief of pain and suffering and sickness among animals. The prevention of cruelty to animals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £212,362
Total expenditure: £304,210

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicester City
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 August 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ANIMAL RESCUE (Working name)
  • LARC (Working name)
  • THE LEICESTER ANIMAL RESCUE CENTRE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PATRICIA ANN MCNEILL Chair
None on record
Judith Jessie Wallis Trustee 10 December 2014
None on record
DEANNA CRICK Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £190.34k £411.91k £814.39k £174.02k £212.36k
Total expenditure £228.45k £223.41k £225.75k £286.58k £304.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.19k £14.86k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £694.96k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £61.77k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £23.86k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £20.14k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £13.67k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £674.85k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £208.39k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £17.36k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 05 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
53 LINDEN DRIVE
LEICESTER
LE5 6AJ
Phone:
01162736515
Email:
No information available