HEPHAISTOS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We will organise musical events where young people can perform alongside professionals, thereby gaining valuable insights into the skills needed for the music/theatre world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 June 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP GILROY | Chair | 13 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HARTNETT CB | Trustee | 13 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYN DONBROSKI | Trustee | 13 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84 | £25 | £49 | £153 | £91 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN APPRECIATION OF CLASSICAL MUSIC THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF HIGH QUALITY MUSIC THEATRE, OPERA, DANCE AND SPOKEN WORD WORKS WHICH INCLUDE STUDENTS/AMATEURS PARTICIPATING ALONGSIDE PROFESSIONAL MUSICIANS AND PERFORMERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Horsecroft Road
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Hertfordshire
HP1 1PZ
- Phone:
- 01442264820
- Email:
- hephaistos@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window