Financial history Midlands Migrant Support

Charity number: 1174056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.27k £7.05k £21.05k £7.01k £15.57k
Total expenditure £14.75k £18.55k £18.03k £8.21k £17.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A