Trustees Midlands Migrant Support
Charity number: 1174056

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carey Alannah Roach | Chair | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Erika Vallillee Loggin | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maria Clara Pirani Della Croce | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cassandra Anne Taylor | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Ellen Godley | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.