COLCHESTER CHINESE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the charity is to provide and assist in the provision of facilities for the education, recreation and other leisure-time occupation of the inhabitants of Colchester and the surrounding areas, in particular but not exclusively members of the Chinese community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 21 June 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Cheng MBE | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
SZE CHOI CHOI | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
WING FAI CHEUNG | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.87k | £25.46k | £22.49k | £48.42k | £60.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.84k | £26.08k | £37.42k | £44.22k | £56.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.80k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 18 May 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2023
(These accounts |
18 May 2024 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 31 May 2023 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 31 May 2023 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 31 May 2023 | 457 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 31 May 2023 | 457 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 22 October 2021 | 236 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 22 October 2021 | 236 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF COLCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEMBERS OF THE CHINESE COMMUNITY, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN CHINESE LANGUAGE, HERITAGE, CULTURE AND THE ARTS, INCLUDING THROUGH WORKSHOPS AND EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-3 Blomfield Place
25 St. Botolphs Street
COLCHESTER
CO2 7EA
- Phone:
- 07769693833
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window