ALFRED CORRY LIFEBOAT MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The museum provides an education and record of the only remaining sailing/rowing lifeboat on the East Coast and also the displays and information of local fishing industry
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 13 March 2017: CIO registration
- 18 March 2022: Funds received from 1039030 SOUTHWOLD MARITIME MUSEUM CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULA GOLDSMITH | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Frederick Assmann | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Thompson | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN BAIRD | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.79k | £29.32k | £10.98k | £11.20k | £9.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.08k | £58.31k | £6.59k | £4.63k | £3.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 16 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 16 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 June 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 26 June 2024 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 21 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN LOCAL MARITIME HISTORY BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Nicholas Drive
Reydon
Southwold
Suffolk
IP18 6RE
- Phone:
- 01502722999
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window