MIDDLETON AND AISLABY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing and operating a small traditional village hall for the benefit of local residents in Middleton and Aislaby villages. Current uses of the hall include classes for Art, Keep Fit, Sewing, Lace making. Other uses include WI and Churchmeetings, other Charity's training sessions,drama productions, exhibitions and musical evenings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £997 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 16 April 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Jonathan Davies | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Richard Andrew Chambers | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart John Plant | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Russell | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.15k | £30.11k | £18.88k | £15.79k | £18.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.09k | £8.34k | £18.52k | £22.11k | £17.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.43k | £3.27k | N/A | £997 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 DECEMBER 1960
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF MIDDLETON AND AISLABY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
MIDDLETON AND AISLABY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
DELFIM HOUSE
BACK LANE SOUTH
MIDDLETON
PICKERING
YO18 8NU
- Phone:
- 01751 473169
- Email:
- info@mavh.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window