Financial history EUROPEAN SOCIETY OF THORACIC SURGEONS

Charity number: 1172020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.42m £527.87k £816.41k £1.84m £2.04m
Total expenditure £1.22m £462.09k £449.41k £1.48m £1.76m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £423.30k £121.72k £308.00k £877.39k £950.67k
Income - Other trading activities £30.32k £215 £6.42k £5.50k £3.00k
Income - Charitable activities £968.54k £405.82k £501.98k £956.48k £1.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £472 £108 £0 £1.62k £17.28k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.20m £461.82k £449.20k £1.48m £1.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £24.46k £264 £206 £599 £115
Expenditure - Governance £18.70k £16.47k £15.00k £17.16k £12.31k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0