Accounts and annual returns DECISION TIME MINISTRIES LTD

Charity number: 1173292
Charity reporting is overdue by 1592 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 131 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 131 days
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 498 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 498 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 863 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 863 days
Annual return 28 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1228 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1228 days
Annual return 29 February 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1592 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1592 days