Veterans Outdoors

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and protect the mental health and well-being of British military veterans, providing support, friendship and outdoor wellbeing for veterans, those still serving and those with a spousal connection. To offer horticultural therapy and other outdoor wellbeing activities, assisting in the treatment and care of such persons who may be in need of socialisation or rehabilitation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 October 2017: CIO registration
- Veterans Outdoors (Working name)
- THE VETERANS FARM ABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAYDN JOHN WHITE | Chair | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Mullane | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Weston-Baker | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Sinclair-Willis | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Griffiths | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.10k | £77.12k | £220.13k | £169.93k | £171.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.57k | £58.40k | £156.17k | £192.66k | £189.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 06 September 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 06 September 2022 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 11 October 2021 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 11 October 2021 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Oct 2017 as amended on 01 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF VETERANS AND EMERGENCY SERVICES PERSONNEL SUFFERING FROM TRAUMA RELATED CONDITIONS BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING RURAL AND CRAFT SKILLS ON FARMS AND ESTATES AND TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Stonesclose
Modbury
IVYBRIDGE
Devon
PL21 0RZ
- Phone:
- 07760729080
- Email:
- info@veteransoutdoors.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window