DEMENTIA FRIENDLY HARTLEPOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting social inclusion for the public benefit of people living with dementia and their families and carers in Hartlepool. Providing information and education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hartlepool
Governance
- 03 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Thomas | Chair | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Booth | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|||||||
Evelyn Hickman | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Tilly | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
Dr Lynne Patricia Humphries | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||
KATE THOMPSON | Trustee | 13 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.45k | £1.97k | £0 | £4.32k | £120 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.06k | £1.19k | £2.12k | £1.57k | £3.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN HARTLEPOOL BY ENSURING THAT PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA ARE ABLE TO REMAIN ACTIVE AND INVOLVED IN THEIR COMMUNITY, DEVELOPING HARTLEPOOL AS A DEMENTIA FRIENDLY COMMUNITY BY - RAISING AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING THOSE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS BY PROVIDING EDUCATION SESSIONS AND EVENTS; PROVIDING INFORMATION AND EDUCATION REGARDING DEMENTIA AND THE PRACTICAL SUPPORT AVAILABLE, USING AWARENESS CAMPAIGNS, INFORMATION SESSIONS, WORKSHOPS, INTERNET INFORMATION HUB AND FORUMS; PROVIDING ADVICE SO THAT THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND BUSINESSES CAN ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER UNDERSTAND AND MEET THE NEEDS OF THOSE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA; BRINGING TOGETHER LOCAL BUSINESSES AND AGENCIES TO WORK CO-OPERATIVELY TO PROVIDE A JOINED UP APPROACH TO UNDERSTANDING THE NEEDS OF THOSE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; ENCOURAGING THOSE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS TO SEEK SUPPORT AND PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO THEM; TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greenbank
Waldon Street
HARTLEPOOL
Cleveland
TS24 7QS
- Phone:
- 01429 222738
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window