KRASZNA-KRAUSZ FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Kraszna Krausz Foundation was created by Andor Kraszna Krausz, the founder of Focal Press. Since 1985 the Kraszna Krausz Foundation Book Awards have been the leading prizes for books on photography and the moving image in the UK. Winning books have been those which make original and lasting educational, professional, historical and cultural contributions to the field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 March 2017: CIO registration
- 08 May 2017: Funds received from 326601 THE KRASZNA-KRAUSZ FOUNDATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR BRIAN WALTER POMEROY | Chair | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dorota Ostrowska | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Field | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
David I Solo | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ethel Joy Gregory | Trustee | 15 September 2017 |
|
|||||
GREGG EVERETT WILSON | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr JAMES LEONARD HYMAN | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|||||
HANNAH BETH REDLER HAWES | Trustee | 01 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL SKREIN | Trustee | 31 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID HYATT | Trustee | 01 July 2008 |
|
|||||
CHARLES BENJAMIN MERULLO | Trustee | 01 November 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.01k | £25.73k | £64.21k | £21.71k | £23.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.31k | £78.26k | £65.42k | £71.02k | £62.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION IMPROVEMENT, DEVELOPMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF PHOTOGRAPHY CINEMATOGRAHY TELEVISION AND THEIR DERIVATIVES AND BY ENCOURAGING A HIGH STANDARD OF ART AND TECHNIQUES IN THE SAID ARTS AND SCIENCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KRASZNA-KRAUSZ FOUNDATION
C/O EON HOUSE
138 PICCADILLY
LONDON
W1J 7NR
- Phone:
- 02074937953
- Email:
- info@kraszna-krausz.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window