Accounts and annual returns I ZINGARI FOOTBALL LEAGUE CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 509814
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2006 31 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2005 25 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2004 30 September 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2004 Not Required