SALAM LADC UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Salam LADC UK aims to relieve the needs of refugees and people displaced by war and/or natural disaster by providing and assisting in the provision of health, education, housing, food distribution and disaster relief services to those in need and by providing grants, items and services to organisations working to relieve such needs, in particular but not exclusively, Salam LADC in Lebanon
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Greece
- Haiti
- Jordan
- Lebanon
- Turkey
Governance
- 24 May 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOJOURN ASHAWNTA WALLACE | Chair | 25 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHERIEF ELSAYED | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER ERIK SMEELE | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAAN ANNER BESAMUSCA | Trustee | 25 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £20.21k | £14.08k | £755 | £1.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.64k | £13.83k | £6.05k | £8.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 November 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 November 2023 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 May 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF REFUGEES AND PEOPLE DISPLACED BY WAR AND/OR NATURAL DISASTER BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF HEALTH, EDUCATION, HOUSING, FOOD DISTRIBUTION AND DISASTER RELIEF SERVICES TO THOSE IN NEED AND BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO RELIEVE SUCH NEEDS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SALAM LADC IN LEBANON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
65 Hackney House
Clydesdale Way
BELVEDERE
Kent
DA17 6FH
- Phone:
- 0016463866551
- Email:
- DAAN.BESAMUSCA@SALAMUK.ORG
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window