HOUGHTON REGIS HERITAGE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the history and heritage of Houghton Regis, through the collection, preservation and making available to the public of material and artefacts of historic significance by the establishment and maintenance of an archive and collection for the preservation of such material and artefacts and by the production of literature, films and recordings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £800 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 19 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID HILL | Chair | 15 May 2017 |
|
|||||
James Carroll | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Dominic Bolan | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Lorna Morison | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Aganoglu | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|||||
JANET EILEEN SMY | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROGER TURNER | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY MCMAHON | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DUDLEY SMY | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.92k | £724 | £2.03k | £2.10k | £2.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £563 | £1.20k | £2.06k | £2.58k | £2.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £500 | £1.30k | £1.15k | £800 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED ON
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE TOWN OF HOUGHTON REGIS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE COLLECTION, PRESERVATION AND MAKING AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC OF MATERIAL AND ARTEFACTS OF HISTORIC SIGNIFICANCE BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ARCHIVE AND COLLECTION FOR THE PRESERVATION OF SUCH MATERIAL AND ARTEFACTS AND BY THE PRODUCTION OF LITERATURE, FILMS AND RECORDINGS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Long Meadow
Houghton Regis
Dunstable
LU5 5RR
- Phone:
- 07305433950
- Email:
- information.hrhs@gmail.com
- Website:
-
hrhs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window